OH SB202 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1701.01, 1701.11, 1701.71, 1704.01, and 1704.05 of the Revised Code to provide exceptions to the applicability of the Control Share Acquisition Act, to require board approval for Act opt-out amendments of a corporation's regulations or articles of incorporation, and to apply a three-year look-back period to ownership of shares for purposes of determining applicability of certain shareholder transaction laws.
Title
To provide exceptions to the applicability of the Control Share Acquisition Act, to require board approval for Act opt-out amendments of a corporation's regulations or articles of incorporation, and to apply a three-year look-back period to ownership of shares for purposes of determining applicability of certain shareholder transaction laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Governor' Action | |
2014-04-12 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-04-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-03-26 | Concurrence | |
2013-11-06 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-10-30 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-10-08 | To Civil Justice | |
2013-10-08 | Introduced to House | |
2014-03-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-02-27 | Committee Report | |
2013-11-07 | To Judiciary | |
2013-11-07 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 01 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 01 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 01 | 71 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 04 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 04 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |