OH SB199 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Concurred in House amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Concurred in House amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 109.731, 311.42, 1547.69, 2923.11, 2923.12, 2923.121, 2923.122, 2923.123, 2923.126, 2923.16, and 2923.21 and to enact sections 2923.1210 and 5103.132 of the Revised Code to specify that an active duty member of the U.S. Armed Forces: (1) does not need a concealed handgun license to carry a handgun concealed if the member is carrying valid military identification and documentation of successful completion of specified firearms training; and (2) may be sold or furnished a handgun if the member has received specified firearms training; to prohibit a business entity from having a policy that prohibits a concealed handgun licensee from transporting or storing a firearm in the person's motor vehicle; to modify the prohibition against carrying a concealed handgun onto institutions of higher education, day-care facilities, aircraft, certain government facilities, public areas of airport terminals, and school safety zones; to allow a sheriff to use concealed handgun license fee revenue to purchase ammunition and firearms; and to authorize certain children's crisis care facilities to maintain firearms.
Title
Permits active duty armed forces to conceal carry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2016-12-08 | House | Passed |
2016-12-07 | House | Informally passed |
2016-12-07 | House | Reported - Substitute: State Government |
2016-05-05 | House | Refer to Committee: State Government |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Civil Justice |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2015-07-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 09 | 731 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
15 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
15 | 47 | 69 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 23 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 1210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 23 | 122 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 123 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 126 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
3 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 11 | 42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
41 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
41 | 12 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 12 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 12 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 12 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
51 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
51 | 03 | 132 | New Code | See Bill Text |