OH SB193 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3501.01, 3501.07, 3505.03, 3505.08, 3505.10, 3506.11, 3513.01, 3513.04, 3513.05, 3513.31, 3513.311, 3513.312, 3517.01, 3517.012, 3517.02, 3517.03, 4503.03, and 5747.29 and to repeal section 3517.015 of the Revised Code to eliminate intermediate political parties and to revise the processes for determining political party status and for establishing new political parties.
Title
To eliminate intermediate political parties and to revise the processes for determining political party status and for establishing new political parties.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Buchy [R] | Sen. Matt Huffman [R] | Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R] | Rep. Lynn Wachtmann [R] |
Rep. William Batchelder [R] | Rep. William Seitz [R] | Sen. John Eklund [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-11-06 - House - House - Conference report agree to (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-05 | Effective Date | |
2013-11-06 | Governor' Action | |
2013-11-18 | End of 10-day period | |
2013-11-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2013-11-06 | Concurrence | |
2013-11-06 | Conference Committee | |
2013-10-08 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-10-08 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-09-19 | To State Government Oversight & Reform | |
2013-09-19 | Introduced to House | |
2013-10-30 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-10-30 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-10-10 | To Policy and Legislative Oversight | |
2013-10-10 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
35 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 01 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 01 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 05 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 05 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 05 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 06 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 13 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 13 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 13 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 13 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 13 | 311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 13 | 312 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 17 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 17 | 012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 17 | 015 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
35 | 17 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 17 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 03 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |