OH SB19 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-6)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Conference managers: Reps. - Merrin, Stoltzfus, Sobecki
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Conference managers: Reps. - Merrin, Stoltzfus, Sobecki
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 306.322, 319.38, 323.08, 5703.21, 5709.09, 5709.17, 5713.08, 5715.27, 5739.023, and 5741.02 and to enact section 323.18 of the Revised Code to modify the law regarding property taxation and sales and use tax.
Title
Create property tax exemption for wetland mitigation projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 1 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | Conference managers: Reps. - Merrin, Stoltzfus, Sobecki |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Conference managers: Sens. - Blessing, Schaffer, Antonio |
2021-11-18 | House | Insist on amendments; asks for committee of conference |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Refused to concur in House amendments |
2021-06-28 | House | Passed - Amended |
2021-06-25 | House | Informally passed |
2021-06-23 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2021-03-03 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Ways and Means |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Environment and Natural Resources
Environment and Natural Resources : Conservancy and Other Districts
Housing and Real Property
State and Local Government
Taxation
Transportation
Environment and Natural Resources : Conservancy and Other Districts
Housing and Real Property
State and Local Government
Taxation
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 06 | 322 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 19 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 23 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 23 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 03 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 13 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 15 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 39 | 023 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 41 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |