OH SB176 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 109.32, 109.572, 718.031, 718.08, 2915.01, 2915.08, 2915.081, 2915.082, 2915.09, 2915.091, 2915.093, 2915.095, 2915.10, 2915.101, 2915.12, 2915.13, 3123.89, 3123.90, 3770.071, 3770.073, 3772.01, 3772.02, 3772.03, 3772.062, 3772.07, 5703.21, 5747.02, 5747.062, 5747.063, 5747.08, 5747.20, 5751.01, 5753.01, 5753.03, 5753.04, 5753.05, 5753.06, 5753.061, 5753.07, 5753.08, and 5753.10 and to enact sections 2915.14, 2915.15, 3772.37, 3775.01, 3775.02, 3775.03, 3775.04, 3775.041, 3775.05, 3775.051, 3775.06, 3775.07, 3775.08, 3775.09, 3775.10, 3775.11, 3775.12, 3775.13, 3775.14, 3775.15, 3775.16, 3775.99, 5753.021, and 5753.031 of the Revised Code to legalize and regulate sports gaming in this state, to levy a tax on businesses that provide sports gaming, and to make other changes to the Gambling Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legalize and regulate sports gaming

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-22HouseRefer to Committee: Finance
2021-06-17HouseIntroduced
2021-06-16SenatePassed - Amended
2021-06-16SenateReported - Substitute: Select Committee on Gaming
2021-05-12SenateRefer to Committee: Select Committee on Gaming
2021-05-06SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10932Amended CodeCitation Text
109572Amended CodeCitation Text
291501Amended CodeCitation Text
291508Amended CodeCitation Text
2915081Amended CodeCitation Text
2915082Amended CodeCitation Text
291509Amended CodeCitation Text
2915091Amended CodeCitation Text
2915093Amended CodeCitation Text
2915095Amended CodeCitation Text
291510Amended CodeCitation Text
2915101Amended CodeCitation Text
291512Amended CodeCitation Text
291513Amended CodeCitation Text
291514New CodeSee Bill Text
291515New CodeSee Bill Text
312389Amended CodeCitation Text
312390Amended CodeCitation Text
3770071Amended CodeCitation Text
3770073Amended CodeCitation Text
377201Amended CodeCitation Text
377202Amended CodeCitation Text
377203Amended CodeCitation Text
3772062Amended CodeCitation Text
377207Amended CodeCitation Text
377237New CodeSee Bill Text
377501New CodeSee Bill Text
377502New CodeSee Bill Text
377503New CodeSee Bill Text
377504New CodeSee Bill Text
3775041New CodeSee Bill Text
377505New CodeSee Bill Text
3775051New CodeSee Bill Text
377506New CodeSee Bill Text
377507New CodeSee Bill Text
377508New CodeSee Bill Text
377509New CodeSee Bill Text
377510New CodeSee Bill Text
377511New CodeSee Bill Text
377512New CodeSee Bill Text
377513New CodeSee Bill Text
377514New CodeSee Bill Text
377515New CodeSee Bill Text
377516New CodeSee Bill Text
377599New CodeSee Bill Text
570321Amended CodeCitation Text
574702Amended CodeCitation Text
5747062Amended CodeCitation Text
5747063Amended CodeCitation Text
574708Amended CodeCitation Text
574720Amended CodeCitation Text
575101Amended CodeCitation Text
575301Amended CodeCitation Text
5753021New CodeSee Bill Text
575303Amended CodeCitation Text
5753031New CodeSee Bill Text
575304Amended CodeCitation Text
575305Amended CodeCitation Text
575306Amended CodeCitation Text
5753061Amended CodeCitation Text
575307Amended CodeCitation Text
575308Amended CodeCitation Text
575310Amended CodeCitation Text
718031Amended CodeCitation Text
71808Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-176
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb176/IN/00/sb176_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb176/RS/01/sb176_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb176/PS/02/sb176_02_PS?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16565&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16757&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17021&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17050&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17056&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17132&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-176

Bill Comments 750

feedback