OH SB168 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 5166.40 and 5166.405 and to enact section 5163.11 of the Revised Code to prohibit the Medicaid program from covering the expansion eligibility group and to require aggregate General Revenue Fund appropriations for state agencies to be reduced by specified amounts for the biennium beginning July 1, 2017, and ending on June 30, 2019.
Title
Prohibit Medicaid expansion and reduce GRF appropriations
Sponsors
Rep. Kris Jordan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 63 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
51 | 63 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 66 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 66 | 405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |