OH SB158 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
Pending: House Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
Pending: House Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4501.21 and to enact section 4503.568 of the Revised Code to create the "Ohio Bullfrog" license plate.
Title
Create Ohio Bullfrog license plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Environment and Natural Resources
Public Safety
Special Designations
Transportation
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Transportation : Vehicle Registration and Titling
Public Safety
Special Designations
Transportation
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Transportation : Vehicle Registration and Titling
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 01 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 03 | 568 | New Code | See Bill Text |