OH SB156 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 9.68 of the Revised Code regarding the regulation of knives.
Title
Regards the regulation of knives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 59 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective 9/13/22 | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2022-06-01 | House | Passed |
2022-04-12 | House | Reported - Amended: Government Oversight |
2021-10-26 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight |
2021-10-25 | House | Introduced |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Passed |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Veterans and Public Safety |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced |