OH SB153 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2915.01 and 2915.091 of the Revised Code to change the definition of "instant bingo ticket dispenser" and to authorize a charitable organization to purchase, lease, and use instant bingo ticket dispensers.
Title
To change the definition of "instant bingo ticket dispenser" and to authorize a charitable organization to purchase, lease, and use instant bingo ticket dispensers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2010-01-27 | Committee Report | |
2009-07-08 | To Finance & Financial Institutions | |
2009-07-08 | Introduced to House | |
2010-02-08 | To State Government | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 15 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=128_SB_153 |
Text | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/BillText128/128_SB_153_PS_Y.html |