OH SB148 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-24 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-24 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2101.44, 3501.01, 3501.02, 3501.05, 3501.051, 3501.053, 3501.11, 3501.13, 3501.17, 3501.18, 3501.20, 3501.22, 3501.26, 3501.27, 3501.28, 3501.29, 3501.30, 3501.301, 3501.31, 3501.32, 3501.33, 3501.35, 3501.37, 3501.38, 3503.02, 3503.06, 3503.10, 3503.14, 3503.15, 3503.16, 3503.18, 3503.19, 3503.21, 3503.24, 3503.26, 3503.28, 3504.02, 3504.04, 3504.05, 3505.07, 3505.08, 3505.11, 3505.13, 3505.16, 3505.17, 3505.18, 3505.181, 3505.182, 3505.183, 3505.20, 3505.21, 3505.23, 3505.24, 3505.26, 3505.28, 3505.29, 3505.30, 3505.31, 3506.05, 3506.12, 3506.15, 3509.01, 3509.03, 3509.031, 3509.04, 3509.05, 3509.06, 3509.07, 3509.08, 3509.09, 3511.02, 3511.04, 3511.05, 3511.06, 3511.07, 3511.08, 3511.09, 3511.10, 3511.11, 3511.13, 3511.14, 3513.02, 3513.131, 3513.18, 3513.19, 3513.21, 3513.30, 3513.31, 3515.04, 3517.01, 3517.012, 3517.992, 3519.01, 3519.16, 3599.07, 3599.17, 3599.19, 3599.31, 4301.32, 4301.334, 4303.29, and 4305.14, to enact new section 3504.01 and sections 3501.111, 3501.302, 3501.40, 3503.05, 3503.20, 3503.22, 3505.05, 3506.021, 3509.051, and 3517.211, and to repeal sections 3503.29, 3504.01, and 3506.16 of the Revised Code to revise the Election Law.
Title
To revise the Election Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-05-19 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-04-12 | To Government Oversight & Reform | |
2011-04-12 | Introduced to House | |
2011-05-25 | To State Government & Elections | |
2011-05-25 | Introduced to Senate |