OH SB134 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Refer to Committee: Economic and Workforce Development
Pending: House Economic and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 3701.353 of the Revised Code to enact The Business Fairness Act and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enact The Business Fairness Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19HouseRefer to Committee: Economic and Workforce Development
2021-05-12SenatePassed - Amended
2021-05-11SenateInformally passed
2021-05-06SenateInformally passed
2021-05-05SenateInformally passed
2021-05-05SenateReported - Substitute: Small Business and Economic Opportunity
2021-03-17SenateRefer to Committee: Small Business and Economic Opportunity
2021-03-16SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3701353New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-134
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb134/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb134/RS/01/sb134_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb134/PS/02/sb134_02_PS?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16112&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16484&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16531&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16534&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16673&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16787&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-134

Bill Comments

feedback