OH SB13 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Reported - Substitute: Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Reported - Substitute: Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 2901.13 of the Revised Code to extend the period of limitations for prosecution of rape or sexual battery when a DNA record made in connection with the investigation of the offense matches another DNA record of an identifiable person and to declare an emergency.
Title
Extends statute of limitations for rape with DNA evidence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | House | Reported - Substitute: Judiciary |
2015-04-14 | House | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2015-03-26 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 01 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |