OH SB128 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Conservation
Pending: House Agriculture and Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Conservation
Pending: House Agriculture and Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3335.38 of the Revised Code with regard to the Ohio State University's Farm Financial Management Institute and to make an appropriation.
Title
Regards OSU's Farm Financial Management Institute
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Conservation |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported: Workforce and Higher Education |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 35 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |