OH SB127 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-29 - Effective 10/29/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4511.01, 4511.213, and 4513.17 of the Revised Code to require motor vehicle operators to take certain actions upon approaching a stationary waste collection vehicle collecting refuse on a roadside.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require actions when driver approaches waste collection vehicle

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-29 Effective 10/29/18
2018-06-27HousePassed
2018-06-27SenateConcurred in House amendments
2018-03-01HouseReported - Amended: Government Accountability and Oversight
2017-10-31HouseRefer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight
2017-10-26HouseIntroduced
2017-10-25SenatePassed
2017-10-24SenateReported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-04-26SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-04-05SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4511Amended CodeCitation Text
451101Amended CodeCitation Text
4511213Amended CodeCitation Text
4513Amended CodeCitation Text
451317Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback