OH SB117 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-17)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-17)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1337.092, 1337.12, 2101.24, 2109.21, 2111.02, 2111.12, 2111.121, 5301.071, 5747.02, 5801.10, 5804.11, 5804.12, 5808.02, 5808.14, 5808.17, 5810.09, and 5810.13; to enact new section 2107.52 and sections 1337.21 to 1337.64, 3793.31 to 3793.39, 5808.18, 5808.19, 5809.031, and 5810.14; and to repeal sections 1337.09, 1337.091, 1337.093, 1337.18, 1337.19, 1337.20, and 2107.52 of the Revised Code to adopt the Uniform Power of Attorney Act; to modify a trustee's duties with respect to life insurance policies, specify a trustee's power to distribute trust principal in further trust, provide for the titling of assets in trust form, permit some but not all of specified parties to enter into a private settlement agreement, and make other changes in the Trust Code; to modify the anti-lapse provisions regarding wills and adopt anti-lapse provisions applicable to trusts; to provide a mechanism for a probate court to order a person who suffers from alcohol and other drug abuse to undergo treatment; and to provide a procedure for the construction or modification of a trust that refers to the federal estate tax, generation-skipping transfer tax, or Ohio estate tax.
Title
To adopt the Uniform Power of Attorney Act; to modify a trustee's duties with respect to life insurance policies, specify a trustee's power to distribute trust principal in further trust, provide for the titling of assets in trust form, permit some but not all of specified parties to enter into a private settlement agreement, and make other changes in the Trust Code; to modify the anti-lapse provisions regarding wills and adopt anti-lapse provisions applicable to trusts; to provide a mechanism for a probate court to order a person who suffers from alcohol and other drug abuse to undergo treatment; and to provide a procedure for the construction or modification of a trust that refers to the federal estate tax, generation-skipping transfer tax, or Ohio estate tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-30 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-15 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-15 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Effective Date | |
2011-12-21 | Governor' Action | |
2011-12-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-12-15 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-11-30 | Concurrence | |
2011-06-21 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-04-07 | Committee Report - A | |
2011-03-10 | To Judiciary Civil Justice | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced to House | |
2011-11-15 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-09-29 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-06-22 | To Judiciary & Ethics | |
2011-06-22 | Introduced to Senate |