OH SB106 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on June 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Effective
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on June 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Effective
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2929.14, 2941.1414, 4123.026, and 4123.651 of the Revised Code regarding workers' compensation coverage for testing when certain medical professionals are exposed to chemical substances or bodily fluids in the course of employment and regarding medical release forms for workers' compensation claims.
Title
Regards workers' comp coverage for certain exposure testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-12 | Effective | |
2024-03-13 | Signed By The Governor | |
2024-03-06 | Sent To The Governor | |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2024-02-07 | House | Passed |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported - Amended: Insurance |
2023-09-26 | House | Referred to committee: Insurance |
2023-09-18 | House | Introduced |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Passed |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Insurance |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to committee: Insurance |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 29 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 41 | 1414 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 026 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 651 | Amended Code | Citation Text |