OH SB1 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 64-33)
Status: Enrolled on September 29 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Concurred in House amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3313.603, 3314.03, and 3326.11 and to enact sections 121.086, 3319.238, and 3319.239 of the Revised Code relating to teaching financial literacy in high school, to provide discretion regarding educational requirements of substitute teachers for the 2021-2022 school year, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards teaching financial literacy in high school

Sponsors

Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Willis Blackshear [D]
Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Rodney Creech [R]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]
Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]
Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]
Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Derek Merrin [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]
Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]
Rep. Sharon Ray [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]
Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]
Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Monique Smith [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Brian Stewart [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]
Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]
Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]
Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]
Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]
Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]
Sen. George Lang [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Sandra O'Brien [R]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]
Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-09-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-06SenateConcurred in House amendments
2021-09-29HousePassed
2021-09-22HouseReported - Substitute: Primary and Secondary Education
2021-05-19HouseRefer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
2021-05-12SenatePassed
2021-05-12SenateReported - Substitute: Primary and Secondary Education
2021-01-26SenateRefer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
121086New CodeSee Bill Text
3313603Amended CodeCitation Text
331403Amended CodeCitation Text
3319238New CodeSee Bill Text
3319239New CodeSee Bill Text
332611Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-1
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb1/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb1/RS/01/sb1_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb1/PS/02/sb1_02_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb1/RH/03/sb1_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb1/PH/04/sb1_04_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb1/EN/05/sb1_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15496&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15511&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16143&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16629&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16640&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16659&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16755&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17405&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17406&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17419&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17433&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17464&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17482&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17527&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-1

Bill Comments

feedback