OH SB1 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 58-11)
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 58-11)
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 6301.14 of the Revised Code to create the OhioMeansJobs Workforce Development Revolving Loan Fund, to create the OhioMeansJobs Workforce Development Revolving Loan Program, to allocate a portion of casino license fees to finance the loan program, and to make an appropriation.
Title
To create the OhioMeansJobs Workforce Development Revolving Loan Fund, to create the OhioMeansJobs Workforce Development Revolving Loan Program, to allocate a portion of casino license fees to finance the loan program, and to make an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-11 | Effective Date | |
2013-07-11 | Governor' Action | |
2013-06-27 | Concurrence | |
2013-04-17 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-04-17 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-02-12 | To Workforce & Economic Development | |
2013-02-12 | Introduced to House | |
2013-06-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-06-25 | Committee Report* | |
2013-04-18 | To *Finance and Appropriations | |
2013-04-18 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
63 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 01 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |