OH HJR12 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-24)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Laws, Acts, and Legislation function MM_findObj(n, d) //v4.01 var p,i,x; if(!d) d=document; if((p=n.indexOf("?"))>0&&parent.frames.length) d=parent.frames[n.substring(p+1)].document; n=n.substring(0,p); if(!(x=d[n])&&d.all) x=d.all[n]; for (i=0;!x&&i for(i=0;!x&&d.layers&&i if(!x && d.getElementById) x=d.getElementById(n); return x; function MM_swapImage() //v3.0 var i,j=0,x,a=MM_swapImage.arguments; document.MM_sr=new Array; for(i=0;i if ((x=MM_findObj(a[i]))!=null)document.MM_sr[j++]=x; if(!x.oSrc) x.oSrc=x.src; x.src=a[i+2]; function MM_swapImgRestore() //v3.0 var i,x,a=document.MM_sr; for(i=0;a&&i function MM_preloadImages() //v3.0 var d=document; if(d.images) if(!d.MM_p) d.MM_p=new Array(); var i,j=d.MM_p.length,a=MM_preloadImages.arguments; for(i=0; i if (a[i].indexOf("#")!=0) d.MM_p[j]=new Image; d.MM_p[j++].src=a[i]; function mmLoadMenus() if (window.mm_menu_0028115540_0) return; window.mm_menu_0028115540_0 = new Menu("root",132,20,"Verdana, Arial, Helvetica, sans-serif",14,"#000000","#FFFFFF","#FFFEEF","#4480AF","center","middle",3,0,1000,-5,7,true,true,false,0,true,true); mm_menu_0028115540_0.addMenuItem("Executive Branch","location='/executive.cfm'"); mm_menu_0028115540_0.addMenuItem("Judicial Branch","location='/judicial.cfm'"); mm_menu_0028115540_0.hideOnMouseOut=true; mm_menu_0028115540_0.menuBorder=1; mm_menu_0028115540_0.menuLiteBgColor='#ffffff'; mm_menu_0028115540_0.menuBorderBgColor='#555555'; mm_menu_0028115540_0.bgColor='#555555'; mm_menu_0028115540_0.writeMenus(); // mmLoadMenus() //--> mmLoadMenus();
Title
Laws, Acts, and Legislation function MM_findObj(n, d) //v4.01 var p,i,x; if(!d) d=document; if((p=n.indexOf("?"))>0&&parent.frames.length) d=parent.frames[n.substring(p+1)].document; n=n.substring(0,p); if(!(x=d[n])&&d.all) x=d.all[n]; for (i=0;!x&&i for(i=0;!x&&d.layers&&i if(!x && d.getElementById) x=d.getElementById(n); return x; function MM_swapImage() //v3.0 var i,j=0,x,a=MM_swapImage.arguments; document.MM_sr=new Array; for(i=0;i if ((x=MM_findObj(a[i]))!=null)document.MM_sr[j++]=x; if(!x.oSrc) x.oSrc=x.src; x.src=a[i+2]; function MM_swapImgRestore() //v3.0 var i,x,a=document.MM_sr; for(i=0;a&&i function MM_preloadImages() //v3.0 var d=document; if(d.images) if(!d.MM_p) d.MM_p=new Array(); var i,j=d.MM_p.length,a=MM_preloadImages.arguments; for(i=0; i if (a[i].indexOf("#")!=0) d.MM_p[j]=new Image; d.MM_p[j++].src=a[i]; function mmLoadMenus() if (window.mm_menu_0028115540_0) return; window.mm_menu_0028115540_0 = new Menu("root",132,20,"Verdana, Arial, Helvetica, sans-serif",14,"#000000","#FFFFFF","#FFFEEF","#4480AF","center","middle",3,0,1000,-5,7,true,true,false,0,true,true); mm_menu_0028115540_0.addMenuItem("Executive Branch","location='/executive.cfm'"); mm_menu_0028115540_0.addMenuItem("Judicial Branch","location='/judicial.cfm'"); mm_menu_0028115540_0.hideOnMouseOut=true; mm_menu_0028115540_0.menuBorder=1; mm_menu_0028115540_0.menuLiteBgColor='#ffffff'; mm_menu_0028115540_0.menuBorderBgColor='#555555'; mm_menu_0028115540_0.bgColor='#555555'; mm_menu_0028115540_0.writeMenus(); // mmLoadMenus() //--> mmLoadMenus();
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | Concurrence | |
2010-01-28 | Conference Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2010-01-26 | Committee Report - S | |
2010-01-14 | To Finance & Financial Institutions | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced to Senate | |
2010-01-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2010-01-13 | Committee Report - S | |
2009-12-07 | To Economic Development | |
2009-12-07 | Introduced to House |