OH HCR8 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-24)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Referred to committee: Veterans and Public Safety
Pending: Senate Veterans and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Referred to committee: Veterans and Public Safety
Pending: Senate Veterans and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To urge the federal government to select Ohio for the permanent headquarters of the United States Space Command.
Title
Urge selection of Ohio as headquarters of the U.S. Space Command
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-13 | Senate | Referred to committee: Veterans and Public Safety |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Offered |
2023-06-27 | House | Adopted |
2023-06-27 | House | Reported: Aviation and Aerospace |
2023-06-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Aviation and Aerospace |
Subjects
Economic Development
House Aviation and Aerospace Committee
Military and Veterans
National or International Resolution
Senate Veterans and Public Safety Committee
House Aviation and Aerospace Committee
Military and Veterans
National or International Resolution
Senate Veterans and Public Safety Committee