OH HCR7 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 61-12)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To urge the United States Congress and the United States Department of Defense to maintain the C-130 fleet at the United States Transportation Command's 2018 Mobility Capabilities and Requirements Study's recommendation of 300 aircraft and to recapitalize the Reserve Component C-130H fleet to the C-130J.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urge Congress/Dept of Defense maintain C130 fleet

Sponsors

Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]
Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]
Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]
Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Sarah Fowler Arthur [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]
Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]
Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]
Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]
Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]
Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Sharon Ray [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]
Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Brian Stewart [R]
Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]
Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]
Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]
Sen. George Lang [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sandra O'Brien [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16SenateAdopted
2021-06-09SenateReported: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-04-28SenateRefer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-04-27SenateOffered
2021-04-22HouseAdopted
2021-04-14HouseReported - Amended: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
2021-03-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to Committee: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HCR-7
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/hcr7/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/hcr7/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/hcr7/AH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/hcr7/RS/03/hcr7_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/hcr7/AS/04/hcr7_04_AS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/hcr7/EN/05/hcr7_05_EN?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HCR-7

Bill Comments

feedback