OH HCR6 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To urge Congress to repeal the Windfall Elimination Provision and the Government Pension Offset.
Title
Urge Congress to repeal Windfall Elimination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-06 - House - House Adopted (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-06 - House - House Adopted (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported: Government Oversight |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Referred to committee: Government Oversight |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Offered |
2023-12-06 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-22 | House | Reported - Substitute: Pensions |
2023-03-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Pensions |
Subjects
House Pensions Committee
Retirement
Senate Government Oversight Committee
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
Retirement
Senate Government Oversight Committee
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees