OH HCR28 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - Refer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education
Pending: Senate Workforce and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - Refer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education
Pending: Senate Workforce and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To urge the National Collegiate Athletics Association to restore the vacated wins and records from the 2010 football season of the Ohio State University.
Title
Urge NCAA reinstate OSU 2010 football wins and record.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 51 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Offered |
2022-05-18 | House | Adopted |
2022-04-06 | House | Reported: Higher Education and Career Readiness |
2021-09-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Higher Education and Career Readiness |