OH HCR27 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 61-35)
Status: Passed on December 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-07 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 61-35)
Status: Passed on December 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-07 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To honor and recognize victims of Agent Orange during the Vietnam War.
Title
Honor and recognize Vietnam War Agent Orange victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-07 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Reported: Veterans and Public Safety |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Offered |
2022-01-26 | House | Adopted |
2021-12-09 | House | Reported: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs |
2021-09-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs |