OH HCR22 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Reported: Veterans and Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Reported: Veterans and Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To urge the United States government to secure its southern border.
Title
Urge United States government to secure southern border.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 59 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 59 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Senate | Reported: Veterans and Public Safety |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety |
2021-11-23 | Senate | Offered |
2021-11-17 | House | Adopted |
2021-11-01 | House | Reported: State and Local Government |
2021-06-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: State and Local Government |