OH HB89 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-10-18 - Effective Date

Summary

To amend section 2305.37 of the Revised Code to provide persons who donate consumer goods to a charitable agency with qualified immunity from civil liability for harm that allegedly arises because the consumer goods are not fit for use and to establish a qualified immunity from civil liability for certain charitable agencies that distribute perishable food or consumer goods free of charge to individuals in need.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer goods/food-donate-immunity

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2007-10-18 Effective Date
2007-07-19 Governor Action
2007-07-23 End of 10-day Period
2007-07-11 Sent to Governor
2007-06-26 Concurrence
2007-06-26 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2007-06-19 Committee Report
2007-05-22 To Judiciary Civil Justice
2007-05-22 Introduced to Senate
2007-05-22 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2007-05-10 Committee Report
2007-03-06 To Judiciary
2007-03-06 Introduced to House

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback