OH HB87 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-5)
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 307.04 of the Revised Code to exempt county utility supply contracts entered into under a joint purchasing program from the 10-year maximum period for such contracts and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempt certain utility supply contracts from 10-year maximum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05SenatePassed
2021-05-04SenateReported: Local Government and Elections
2021-04-21SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government and Elections
2021-03-25SenateIntroduced
2021-03-24HousePassed
2021-03-10HouseReported - Substitute: State and Local Government
2021-02-10HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2021-02-09HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30704Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-87
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb87/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb87/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb87/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb87/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb87/PS/04/hb87_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb87/EN/05/hb87_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15653&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15847&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15994&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16001&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16248&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16403&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16508&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16507&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16517&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16549&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16655&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-87

Bill Comments 750

feedback