OH HB80 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - Effective 7/22/19 - Certain provisions effective October 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4123.038 and 4131.03 of the Revised? Code to make changes to the Workers' Compensation? Law, to make appropriations for the Bureau of? Workers' Compensation for the biennium beginning? July 1, 2019, and ending June 30, 2021, and to? provide authorization and conditions for the? operation of the Bureau's programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates FY 2020-2021 Workers' Compensation budget

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - House - House Failed (Y: 4 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-22 Effective 7/22/19 - Certain provisions effective October 21, 2019
2019-07-17SenateConference report agreed to
2019-07-17SenateMotion to reconsider
2019-07-17SenateConference report agreed to
2019-07-17HouseConference report agreed to: Conference Committee on HB 80
2019-07-16SenateConference managers: Sens. - Hackett, Huffman, M., Craig: Conference Committee on HB 80
2019-07-16HouseConference managers: Reps. - Oelslager, Brinkman, Cera
2019-07-01SenateInsist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
2019-06-30HouseRefused to concur in Senate amendments
2019-06-27SenatePassed
2019-06-27SenateReported - Substitute: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2019-06-11SenateRefer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2019-06-06SenateIntroduced
2019-06-05HousePassed - Amended
2019-06-05HouseReported - Substitute: Finance
2019-05-22HouseRe-referred: Finance
2019-05-21HouseRe-referred: Insurance
2019-02-20HouseRefer to Committee: Insurance
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41Amended CodeCitation Text
4123Amended CodeCitation Text
4123038Amended CodeCitation Text
4131Amended CodeCitation Text
413103Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-HB-80
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb80/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb80/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb80/RCH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb80/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb80/PH/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb80/RS/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb80/PS/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb80/CR/07?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb80/EN/08?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-HB-80

Bill Comments

feedback