OH HB80 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
Pending: Senate Government Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
Pending: Senate Government Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3313.813 of the Revised Code to require school districts to allow approved summer food service program sponsors to use school facilities to provide food service for summer intervention services under certain conditions.
Title
Provide food service for school summer intervention services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-15 | House | Passed |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported - Amended: Education and Career Readiness |
2017-02-28 | House | Refer to Committee: Education and Career Readiness |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 13 | 813 | Amended Code | Citation Text |