OH HB77 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Referred to committee: Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Referred to committee: Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4561.15 and to enact sections 4561.50, 4561.51, 4561.52, and 4561.53 of the Revised Code to establish requirements and prohibitions governing the operation of unmanned aerial vehicles in Ohio.
Title
Regards the operation of unmanned aerial vehicles in Ohio
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Senate | Referred to committee: Transportation |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-04-24 | House | Passed |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported - Amended: Aviation and Aerospace |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to committee: Aviation and Aerospace |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
House Aviation and Aerospace Committee
Senate Transportation Committee
Transportation
Transportation : Air and Rail Transport
Senate Transportation Committee
Transportation
Transportation : Air and Rail Transport
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 61 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 61 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 61 | 51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 61 | 52 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 61 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text |