OH HB716 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 52-22)
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-03 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-03 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4743.04 and 5903.04 and to enact section 4743.041 of the Revised Code to require state occupational licensing agencies, under certain circumstances, to issue temporary licenses or certificates to members of the military and spouses who are licensed in another jurisdiction and have moved to Ohio for active duty.
Title
Issue temporary license to out-of-state licensees on active duty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-11-28 | House | Passed - Amended |
2018-11-28 | House | Reported - Amended: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Homeland Security |
2018-11-13 | House | Refer to Committee: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Homeland Security |
2018-07-30 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 43 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 43 | 041 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
59 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
59 | 03 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |