OH HB7 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Effective 3/16/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 3302.036 and to enact section 3301.0728 of the Revised Code to prohibit individual student scores from certain elementary and secondary achievement assessments administered for the 2014-2015 school year from being used to determine promotion or retention or to grant course credit, to revise state scholarship program eligibility, to make changes regarding the administration of high school end-of-course examinations, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addresses school testing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-16 Effective 3/16/15
2015-03-10HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2015-03-04SenatePassed - Amended
2015-02-26SenateReported - Substitute: Education
2015-02-18SenateTo committee: Education
2015-02-17SenateIntroduced
2015-02-11HousePassed
2015-02-11HouseReported - Amended: Education
2015-01-29HouseRefer to Committee: Education
2015-01-28HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3301New CodeSee Bill Text
33010728New CodeSee Bill Text
3302Amended CodeCitation Text
3302036Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback