OH HB69 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-14)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18 - Certain provisions effective 12/22/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-14)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18 - Certain provisions effective 12/22/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 715.691, 5705.03, 5709.40, 5709.634, 5739.021, 5739.023, and 5739.026 of the Revised Code and to amend Sections 387.10 and 387.20 of Am. Sub. H.B. 49 of the 132nd General Assembly to require reimbursement of certain township fire and emergency medical service levy revenue forgone because of the creation of a municipal tax increment financing district, to authorize subdivisions to remove territory from existing joint economic development zones (JEDZs), to authorize townships to enter into enterprise zone agreements with retail businesses with the approval of the affected school district, to allow a county or transit authority to levy sales tax in increments of 0.25%, to modify the procedures by which resolutions proposing the levy of property taxes are submitted to electors, and to increase the appropriation for the Medicaid Local Sales Tax Transition Fund.
Title
Reimburse medical service levy revenue forgone because of TIF
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Effective 3/23/18 - Certain provisions effective 12/22/17 | |
2017-12-13 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Passed |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-06-21 | House | Passed |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported - Amended: State and Local Government |
2017-02-21 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Economic Development
Health and Human Services
Housing and Real Property
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : Local Government
Taxation
Health and Human Services
Housing and Real Property
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : Local Government
Taxation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 05 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 09 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 634 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 39 | 021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 39 | 023 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 39 | 026 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
7 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
7 | 15 | 691 | Amended Code | Citation Text |