OH HB68 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-07 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-07 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To enact sections 901.91 to 901.95 of the Revised Code to establish the healthy farms and healthy schools grant program for the purpose of providing grants to schools to establish nutrition education and agricultural education programs for kindergarteners.
Title
To establish the healthy farms and healthy schools grant program for the purpose of providing grants to schools to establish nutrition education and agricultural education programs for kindergarteners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | To Education | |
2009-05-07 | Introduced to Senate | |
2009-05-06 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-04-30 | Committee Report - A | |
2009-03-10 | To Agriculture & Natural Resources | |
2009-03-10 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
9 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 01 | 91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 01 | 92 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 01 | 93 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 01 | 94 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=128_HB_68 |
Text | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/BillText128/128_HB_68_PH_Y.html |