OH HB555 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3301.079, 3301.0710, 3301.0711, 3301.0714, 3301.0715, 3302.01, 3302.02, 3302.021, 3302.03, 3302.033, 3302.04, 3302.041, 3302.05, 3302.10, 3302.12, 3302.20, 3302.21, 3310.03, 3310.06, 3311.741, 3311.80, 3313.473, 3313.608, 3314.011, 3314.012, 3314.013, 3314.015, 3314.016, 3314.02, 3314.05, 3314.35, 3314.36, 3314.37, 3317.081, 3319.11, 3319.111, 3319.112, 3319.58, 3326.03, 3333.041, 3333.048, 3333.391, 5910.01, 5910.02, and 5919.34; to enact sections 3302.034, 3310.16, 3314.017, 3314.351, 3314.361, and 5910.07 of the Revised Code; and to amend Section 267.10.90 of Am. Sub. H.B. 153 of the 129th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to create a new academic performance rating system for public schools; to require an alternative rating system for community schools with dropout prevention and recovery programs; to create a new evaluation process for community school sponsors; to abolish the Ohio Accountability Task Force to make changes in the third grade reading guarantee; to modify the procedure for approving the opening of new Internet- or computer-based community schools; to make changes in the War Orphans Scholarship and Ohio National Guard Scholarship programs; and to make other changes to education laws.
Title
; and to amend Section 267.10.90 of Am. Sub. H.B. 153 of the 129th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to create a new academic performance rating system for public schools; to require an alternative rating system for community schools with dropout prevention and recovery programs; to create a new evaluation process for community school sponsors; to abolish the Ohio Accountability Task Force to make changes in the third grade reading guarantee; to modify the procedure for approving the opening of new Internet- or computer-based community schools; to make changes in the War Orphans Scholarship and Ohio National Guard Scholarship programs; and to make other changes to education laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 59 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 56 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 55 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 57 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 59 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 56 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 55 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 57 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Effective Date | |
2012-12-20 | Governor' Action | |
2012-12-31 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-12-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-12-13 | Concurrence | |
2012-12-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-12-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-12-04 | To Education | |
2012-12-04 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-11-29 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-11-29 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-05-22 | To Education | |
2012-05-22 | Introduced to House |