OH HB513 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 5743.01, 5743.51, 5743.53, 5743.63, and 5743.64 and to enact sections 9.681 and 5743.06 of the Revised Code regarding the deduction and recovery of bad debts for cigarette and tobacco and vapor products taxes, the taxation of certain vapor product manufacturers and importers, and local regulation of tobacco products and alternative nicotine products.
Title
Regards bad debts for cigarette, tobacco, vapor product taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-06-01 | House | Passed |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2022-01-25 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2021-12-14 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 43 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 43 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |