OH HB50 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Effective 10/29/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Effective 10/29/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 339.062 of the Revised Code to require that all rights to and interests in charter county hospital employee discoveries, inventions, or patents are the property of the charter county hospital.
Title
Declare certain hospital employee inventions property of hospital
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Effective 10/29/19 | |
2019-07-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported: Government Oversight and Reform |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported - Amended: Civil Justice |
2019-02-13 | House | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
3 | 39 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 39 | 062 | New Code | See Bill Text |