OH HB5 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-12)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2007 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2007-06-14 - To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2007 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2007-06-14 - To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Summary
To amend sections 163.01, 163.02, 163.04, 163.05, 163.06, 163.09, 163.14, 163.15, 163.19, 163.21, 163.53, 163.62, 303.26, 719.012, 725.01, 1728.01, 2505.02, and 3735.40 and to enact sections 1.08, 163.021, 163.211, and 163.63 of the Revised Code to implement the recommendations of the Eminent Domain Task Force and to create other procedures to protect the rights of property owners.
Title
Eminent domain - General Assembly intent to reform law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-14 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2007-06-14 | Introduced to Senate | |
2007-06-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-06-07 | Committee Report | |
2007-02-20 | To Judiciary | |
2007-02-20 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_5 |