OH HB489 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-11)
Status: Enrolled on November 28 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-05 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 28 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-05 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1101.05, 1109.20, 1121.10, 1125.23, 1181.08, 1322.01, 1322.07, 1322.09, 1322.12, 1322.34, 1322.40, 1322.50, 1733.01, 1733.04, 1733.041, 1733.05, 1733.13, 1733.14, 1733.16, 1733.19, 1733.22, 1733.24, 1733.32, 1733.329, and 1733.39, to enact sections 103.31, 1121.101, 1121.61, 1349.72, 1733.051, 1733.152, 1733.328, 1733.441, and 1733.53, and to repeal section 1733.26 of the Revised Code to revise the laws governing credit unions, to provide some regulatory relief to state banks and credit unions, to provide for data analytics to be conducted on publicly available information regarding banks, credit unions, and consumer finance companies, to require registration of mortgage loan servicers, and to require a specified notice be given to a debtor for certain debt collection.
Title
Address financial institution regulation and consumer protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-05 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Passed |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-04-11 | House | Passed |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2018-02-14 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Commerce : Consumer Finance
Commerce : Financial Institutions
Housing and Real Property : Foreclosures
Taxation
Commerce : Financial Institutions
Housing and Real Property : Foreclosures
Taxation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 03 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
11 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
11 | 01 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
11 | 09 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
11 | 21 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 21 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21 | 61 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
11 | 25 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 81 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
11 | 81 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
13 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
13 | 22 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 49 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 49 | 72 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 33 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | 041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | 051 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 33 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | 152 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 33 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | 26 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | 328 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 33 | 329 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | 441 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 33 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
21 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 17 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 26 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 26 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |