OH HB466 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3701.83 and to enact sections 3724.01, 3724.02, 3724.03, 3724.04, 3724.05, 3724.06, 3724.07, 3724.08, 3724.09, 3724.10, 3724.11, 3724.12, 3724.13, 3724.14, and 3724.99 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 261.150 of H.B. 110 of the 134th General Assembly to establish requirements for the registration and operation of health care staffing agencies, to make changes relating to the fiscal year 2023 payment rates for intermediate care facilities for individuals with intellectual disabilities, to allow an extension of time to begin a project under a certificate of need granted during the COVID-19 pandemic, to amend the version of section 3701.83 of the Revised Code that is scheduled to take effect on September 30, 2024, to continue the change on and after that date, and to make an appropriation.
Title
Establish requirements for health care staffing agencies
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Edwards [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | House | Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference |
2022-05-31 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported - Substitute: Commerce and Labor |
2021-11-02 | House | Refer to Committee: Commerce and Labor |
2021-10-26 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Finance and Appropriations
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Long-Term Care
Health and Human Services : Medicaid
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Long-Term Care
Health and Human Services : Medicaid
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 01 | 83 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 24 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 99 | New Code | See Bill Text |