OH HB456 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-14 - Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Medicaid Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 3727.53 and to enact section 3727.58 of the Revised Code to prohibit a hospital from requiring a registered nurse or licensed practical nurse to work overtime as a condition of continued employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit requiring nurses to work overtime

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 77 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-14SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2018-06-11SenateIntroduced
2018-06-07HousePassed
2018-04-11HouseReported - Substitute: Health
2018-01-16HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2017-12-28HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3727Amended CodeCitation Text
372753Amended CodeCitation Text
372758New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback