OH HB428 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-15)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-02-09 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact sections 103.55, 103.551, and 103.552 of the Revised Code to establish the Adverse Childhood Experiences Study Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish Adverse Childhood Experiences Study Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-09SenateRefer to Committee: Health
2022-02-02SenateIntroduced
2022-01-26HousePassed
2022-01-24HouseInformally passed
2022-01-18HouseInformally passed
2021-12-14HouseInformally passed
2021-12-09HouseInformally passed
2021-12-09HouseReported - Substitute: Behavioral Health and Recovery Supports
2021-09-22HouseRefer to Committee: Behavioral Health and Recovery Supports
2021-09-20HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10355New CodeSee Bill Text
103551New CodeSee Bill Text
103552New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-428
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb428/IN/00/hb428_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb428/RH/01/hb428_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb428/PH/02/hb428_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17501&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17604&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18054&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18058&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18239&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18231&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-428

Bill Comments

feedback