OH HB422 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - Refer to Committee: Local Government and Elections
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - Refer to Committee: Local Government and Elections
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 701.10, 729.49, 735.29, and 743.04 and to enact sections 319.65, 701.101, 701.102, 701.20, 701.21, 701.22, 701.23, 701.24, 701.25, 701.26, 729.491, 729.492, 735.291, 743.041, 3745.15, 3745.151, 3745.152, 3745.153, 3745.154, 3745.155, 3745.156, 3745.157, 3745.158, 3745.159, 3745.1510, and 3745.1511 of the Revised Code regarding limitations on recovery and lien imposition by municipalities against property owners of non-owner-occupied properties for unpaid water, sewer, and disposal services rates and charges.
Title
Regards billing for municipal utility, other services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government and Elections |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-05-18 | House | Passed |
2022-05-17 | House | Reported - Amended: Rules and Reference |
2022-05-16 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2022-03-08 | House | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2021-09-22 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2021-09-16 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 19 | 65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 45 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 45 | 151 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 45 | 1510 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 45 | 1511 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 45 | 152 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 45 | 153 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 45 | 154 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 45 | 155 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 45 | 156 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 45 | 157 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 45 | 158 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 45 | 159 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 01 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 01 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 01 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 01 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 01 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 01 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 01 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 01 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 01 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 01 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 29 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 29 | 491 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 29 | 492 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 35 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 35 | 291 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 43 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 43 | 041 | New Code | See Bill Text |