OH HB422 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-10)
Status: Enrolled on December 19 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-27 - Excuse from Voting on Senate Amendments Letter
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 19 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-27 - Excuse from Voting on Senate Amendments Letter
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4909.05 and to enact sections 4905.481, 4905.49, 4905.491, 4909.051, 4909.052, 4909.053, 4909.054, 4909.055, 4909.057, and 4909.059 of the Revised Code, to amend Section 4 of Am. H.B. 400 of the 114th General Assembly, and to repeal Sections 2 and 3 of Am. H.B. 400 of the 114th General Assembly to govern acquisitions of municipal water-works and sewage disposal system companies by certain larger nonmunicipal water-works or sewage disposal system companies and to release certain conditions with respect to the conveyance of state-owned real estate to the Miami Valley Research Foundation.
Title
Govern acquisitions of municipal waterworks and sewage systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-27 | House | Excuse from Voting on Senate Amendments Letter |
2018-12-27 | House | Speaker Signed |
2018-12-27 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Passed |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Public Utilities |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Public Utilities |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported: Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-11-28 | House | Refer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-11-21 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
49 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 05 | 481 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 05 | 49 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 05 | 491 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
49 | 09 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 09 | 051 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 09 | 052 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 09 | 053 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 09 | 054 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 09 | 055 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 09 | 057 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 09 | 059 | New Code | See Bill Text |