OH HB415 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-25 - To Highways & Transportation
Pending: Senate Highways and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-25 - To Highways & Transportation
Pending: Senate Highways and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 4511.204 of the Revised Code to prohibit driving a vehicle while writing, sending, or reading a text-based communication on an electronic wireless communications device.
Title
To prohibit driving a vehicle while writing, sending, or reading a text-based communication on an electronic wireless communications device.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | To Highways & Transportation | |
2010-03-25 | Introduced to Senate | |
2010-03-24 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2010-03-10 | Committee Report - S | |
2010-01-19 | To Public Safety & Homeland Security | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
45 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 11 | 204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=128_HB_415 |
Text | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/BillText128/128_HB_415_PH_Y.html |