OH HB415 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2008 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-06-03 - To Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2008 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-06-03 - To Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Summary
To amend section 959.99 of the Revised Code to increase the penalty for animal fighting, including cockfighting.
Title
Animal fighting (including cockfighting & dogfighting) increase penalty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-06-03 | To Agriculture | |
2008-06-03 | Introduced to Senate | |
2008-05-29 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2008-05-15 | Committee Report | |
2007-12-18 | To Criminal Justice | |
2007-12-18 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_415 |