OH HB402 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-13 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 128.01, 128.32, 4905.402, 4905.61, 4927.02, 4927.101, 4927.12, 4927.17, and 4927.19 and to enact sections 4927.121, 4927.122, 4927.123, 4927.124, and 4927.125 of the Revised Code to revise state regulation of telephone companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise state regulation of telephone companies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-13HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-12-13SenatePassed
2018-12-13SenateInformally passed
2018-12-06SenateReported - Substitute: Public Utilities
2018-09-25SenateRefer to Committee: Public Utilities
2018-06-26SenateIntroduced
2018-06-20HousePassed
2018-04-11HouseReported - Substitute: Public Utilities
2017-11-28HouseRefer to Committee: Public Utilities
2017-10-31HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
128Amended CodeCitation Text
12801Amended CodeCitation Text
12832Amended CodeCitation Text
41Amended CodeCitation Text
4165Amended CodeCitation Text
416501Amended CodeCitation Text
49Amended CodeCitation Text
4905Amended CodeCitation Text
4905402Amended CodeCitation Text
490561Amended CodeCitation Text
4927Amended CodeCitation Text
492702Amended CodeCitation Text
492708Repealed CodeCitation Text
4927101Amended CodeCitation Text
4927102New CodeSee Bill Text
492712Amended CodeCitation Text
4927121New CodeSee Bill Text
4927122New CodeSee Bill Text
4927123New CodeSee Bill Text
4927124New CodeSee Bill Text
4927125New CodeSee Bill Text
492717Amended CodeCitation Text
492719Amended CodeCitation Text
4931Amended CodeCitation Text
493105Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback