OH HB402 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-26)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 5703.05 and to enact section 5703.77 of the Revised Code to require the Tax Commissioner to notify taxpayers of tax or fee overpayments, to authorize the Commissioner to either apply an overpayment to future tax liabilities or issue a refund, and to make an appropriation.
Title
To require the Tax Commissioner to notify taxpayers of tax or fee overpayments, to authorize the Commissioner to either apply an overpayment to future tax liabilities or issue a refund, and to make an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | To Finance | |
2014-03-27 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-03-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-03-12 | Committee Report* | |
2014-01-14 | To *Finance and Appropriations | |
2014-01-14 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 03 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 03 | 77 | New Code | See Bill Text |