OH HB4 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 56-28)
Status: Passed on February 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-09 - Effective 5/30/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2151.142, 2151.421, and 3107.014 and to enact sections 2151.4210, 2151.4211, 2151.4212, 2151.4213, 2151.4215, 2151.4216, 2151.4218, 2151.4219, 2151.4220, 2151.4221, 2151.4222, 2151.4223, 2151.4224, 5101.89, 5101.891, 5101.892, 5101.893, 5101.894, 5101.895, 5101.897, and 5101.899 of the Revised Code regarding county child abuse and neglect memorandums of understanding, cross-reporting of child abuse and neglect reports by public children services agencies to law enforcement agencies, notification of reporter rights, home assessor eligibility, and creation of the youth and family ombudsman office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards child abuse and neglect reporting

Sponsors

Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Susan Manchester [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]
Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Willis Blackshear [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]
Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Rodney Creech [R]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]
Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]
Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Derek Merrin [R]
Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Sharon Ray [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]
Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]
Rep. Monique Smith [D]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]
Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Bob Young [R]
Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]
Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]
Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]
Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]
Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-09 Effective 5/30/22
2022-02-09HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2022-02-09SenatePassed
2022-01-26SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2021-06-02SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2021-05-26HousePassed - Amended
2021-05-25HouseReported - Substitute: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-02-04HouseRefer to Committee: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-02-03HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2151142Amended CodeCitation Text
2151421Amended CodeCitation Text
21514210New CodeSee Bill Text
21514211New CodeSee Bill Text
21514212New CodeSee Bill Text
21514213New CodeSee Bill Text
21514215New CodeSee Bill Text
21514216New CodeSee Bill Text
21514218New CodeSee Bill Text
21514219New CodeSee Bill Text
21514220New CodeSee Bill Text
21514221New CodeSee Bill Text
21514222New CodeSee Bill Text
21514223New CodeSee Bill Text
21514224New CodeSee Bill Text
3107014Amended CodeCitation Text
510189New CodeSee Bill Text
5101891New CodeSee Bill Text
5101892New CodeSee Bill Text
5101893New CodeSee Bill Text
5101894New CodeSee Bill Text
5101895New CodeSee Bill Text
5101897New CodeSee Bill Text
5101899New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-4
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb4/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb4/RH/01/hb4_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb4/PH/02/hb4_02_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb4/RS/03/hb4_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb4/PS/04/hb4_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb4/EN/05/hb4_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15541&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15974&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16671&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16672&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16834&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16839&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16858&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16865&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18036&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18202&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18215&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18214&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18331&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18335&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18716&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19212&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-4

Bill Comments

feedback