OH HB394 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-11 - To Finance & Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Finance and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-11 - To Finance & Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Finance and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 101.27 of the Revised Code to require that a member of the General Assembly in fact travel to or from the member's residence and to or from the seat of government to receive a travel reimbursement.
Title
To require that a member of the General Assembly in fact travel to or from the member's residence and to or from the seat of government to receive a travel reimbursement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | To Finance & Financial Institutions | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced to Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2010-02-25 | Committee Report | |
2009-12-11 | To State Government | |
2009-12-11 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 01 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |